No. 23A663 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Brandon De McCall, Applicant
v.
Texas
Docketed:January 18, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(AP-77, 095)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2024Application (23A663) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2024 to March 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/OpinionsOther
Jan 19 2024Application (23A663) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 22, 2024.
Feb 09 2024Application (23A663) to extend further the time from February 22, 2024 to March 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Proof of ServiceWritten RequestWritten Request
Feb 15 2024Application (23A663) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 25, 2024.