No. 23A660
Title:Marcus Kelly, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:January 18, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-12588)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2024Application (23A660) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2024 to February 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Jan 18 2024Application (23A660) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcus Kelly104838
Everglades Correctional Institution
1599 S.W. 187th Ave.
Miami, FL 33194

Party name: Marcus Kelly