No. 23A655
Title:Kristopher Dean Putnam, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 17, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-51061)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2024Application (23A655) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2024 to March 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 17 2024Application (23A655) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kristin L. Davidson
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
300 Convent Street
Suite 2300
San Antonio, TX 78205

KRISTIN_DAVIDSON@FD.ORG
(210) 472-6700
Party name: Kristopher Dean Putnam
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States