No. 23A654 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Isaiah Glenndell Tryon, Applicant
v.
Christe Quick, Acting Warden, Oklahoma State Penitentiary
Docketed:January 16, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6097)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2024Application (23A654) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2024 to March 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Application (23A654) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Callie Felicea Heller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender, WDOK
215 Dean A. McGee Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

callie_heller@fd.org
405-609-5978
Party name: Isaiah Tryon