No. 23A651
Title:Sunoco LP, et al., Applicants
v.
City and County of Honolulu, Hawaii, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Hawaii
   Case Numbers:(SCAP-22-0000429)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2024Application (23A651) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2024 to February 28, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Application (23A651) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 28, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Sunoco LP, et al.