No. 23A650
Title:Scott Smith, Applicant
v.
Entrepreneur Media Inc., a California Corporation
Docketed:January 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-55459)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2024Application (23A650) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jan 16 2024Application (23A650) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Smith
    Counsel of Record
5716 Folsom Blvd., Suite 140
Sacramento, CA 95819

scott@bizstarz.com
(916) 453-8611
Party name: Scott Smith