No. 23A647
Title:Bernadette Dickerson, Applicant
v.
Koch Foods, LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 12, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-12434)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 12 2024Application (23A647) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 27, 2024 to April 27, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Jan 12 2024Application (23A647) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 28, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bernadette Dickerson
    Counsel of Record
5060 Woodley Road
Montgomery, AL 36116

Party name: Bernadette Dickerson