No. 23A642
Title:Country Mutual Insurance Company, Applicant
v.
Angela Sudholt, et al.
Docketed:January 11, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2507)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 09 2024Application (23A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2024 to March 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 12 2024Application (23A642) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until March 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: Country Mutual Insurance Company