No. 23A640
Title:Frank Garcia, Applicant
v.
Joseph Noeth
Docketed:January 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-393)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2023Application (23A640) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2024 to March 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jan 10 2024Application (23A640) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frank Garcia
    Counsel of Record
09B2727
639 Exchange Street
Attica, NY 14011

Party name: Frank Garcia