No. 23A639
Title:Mississippi District Council for Assemblies of God, Applicant
v.
Kevin Beachy, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Mississippi
   Case Numbers:(2021-CA-1007-SCT)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2024Application (23A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 16 2024Application (23A639) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 16, 2024.
Feb 06 2024Application (23A639) to extend further the time from February 16, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestWritten Request
Feb 08 2024Application (23A639) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Mississippi District Council Assemblies of God
Michael Hugh McGinleyDechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Mississippi District Council Assemblies of God