No. 23A637
Title:AT&T Services, Inc., et al., Applicants
v.
Robert J. Bugielski, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-56196)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2024Application (23A637) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to March 7, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 11 2024Application (23A637) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 7, 2024.
Feb 26 2024Application of AT&T Services, Inc., et al. for a further extension of time submitted.
Written RequestProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

AHO@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(214) 698-3100
Party name: AT&T Services, Inc., et al.