No. 23A636
Title:Weili Cao-Bossa, Applicant
v.
Department of Labor
Docketed:January 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2593)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2024Application (23A636) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Jan 09 2024Application (23A636) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Weili Cao-Bossa
    Counsel of Record
1912 E. Country Club Dr.
Niskayuna, NY 12309

(518) 878-5638
Party name: Weili Cao-Bossa
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Dept. of Labor