No. 23A635
Title:Jereme Lee Escobedo, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:January 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10573)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2023Application (23A635) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2024 to March 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 09 2024Application (23A635) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 31, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jereme Lee Escobedo
    Counsel of Record
TDCJ #02190183
H.H. Coffield Unit
2661 FM 2054
Tennessee Colony, TX 75884-5000

Party name: Jereme L. Escobedo