No. 23A631
Title:Peter Williams, Applicant
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:January 9, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1314)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2024Application (23A631) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2024 to March 24, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 11 2024Application (23A631) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

LJOSEPH@LARRYJOSEPH.COM
2023559452
Party name: Peter Williams
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al.