No. 23A629 | |
Title: | Henry Eugene Gossage, Applicant v. Reality Homes, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | January 9, 2024 |
Linked with 23-946 | |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 2 |
Case Numbers: | (57120-0-II) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 15 2023 | Application (23A629) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 5, 2023 to November 4, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main Document | |
Jan 11 2024 | Application (23A629) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 4, 2023. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Henry E. Gossage Counsel of Record | PO Box 1102 Ocean Shores, WA 98569 | (360) 438-1069 |
Party name: Henry Gossage |