No. 23A628
Title:Gerald Ostipow, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Royetta L.. Ostipow, Applicant
v.
William L. Federspiel
Docketed:January 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1414)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 04 2023Application (23A628) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2024 to April 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 09 2024Application (23A628) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until April 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Philip Lee Ellison
    Counsel of Record
Outside Legal Counsel PLC
16690 West Gratiot Rd, Suite 2
PO Box 107
Hemlock, MI 48626

pellison@olcplc.com
9896420055
Party name: Gerald Ostipow