No. 23A627 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Byron James Shepard, Applicant
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:January 8, 2024
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(D-2020-8)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2024Application (23A627) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 18, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Jan 08 2024Application (23A627) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until March 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jacqueline Humphrey Chafin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
111 N. Peters Avenue, Suite 100
Norman, OK 73069

jacy.chafin@oids.ok.gov
4058373207
Party name: Byron James Shepard