No. 23A622
Title:Kari Lake, et al., Applicants
v.
Adrian Fontes, Arizona Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:January 5, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-16413)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2024Application (23A622) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2024 to February 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jan 05 2024Application (23A622) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 15, 2024.
Feb 01 2024Application (23A622) to extend further the time from February 15, 2024 to March 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written Request
Feb 05 2024Application (23A622) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 14, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

LJOSEPH@LARRYJOSEPH.COM
2023559452
Party name: Kari Lake, et al.