No. 23A619
Title:Steven Antonius, aka Sealed Defendant 1, Shervington Lovell, aka Sealed Defendant 1, Argemiro Zapata-Castro, aka Sealed Defendant 1, Applicants
v.
United States
Docketed:January 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1083, 21-1409, 21-2082)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2023Application (23A619) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2024 to March 10, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Application (23A619) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jill R. Shellow
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jill R. Shellow PLLC
15 Chester Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601

jrs@shellowlaw.com
212-792-4911
Party name: Steven Antonius, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States