No. 23A615
Title:Curtis Dwayne Vaughn, Applicant
v.
Sean M. Flannery, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2962)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2023Application (23A615) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 11, 2024 to March 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jan 04 2024Application (23A615) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Curtis D. Vaughn1825 East Republic Rd.
Apt. 6404
Springfield, MO 658041

vau123@live.missouristate.edu
(417) 718-0156
Party name: Curtis Vaughn