No. 23A606
Title:Therese M. Waters, on Behalf of Kelly E. Waters, Applicant
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1997)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2023Application (23A606) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Application (23A606) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas James Waters
    Counsel of Record
The Running Wise Law Firm
1501 Cass St.
Ste. D
Traverse City, MI 49685

tjw@runningwise.com
517-402-8044
Party name: Therese Waters
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Secretary of Health and Human Services