No. 23A604
Title:Zehava Friedman, et al., Applicants
v.
Republic of Hungary, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-7010, 22-7013, 22-7112)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2023Application (23A604) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2024 to February 9, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 03 2024Application (23A604) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 9, 2024.
Jan 30 2024Application (23A604) to extend further the time from February 9, 2024 to March 8, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 02 2024Application (23A604) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles S. Fax
    Counsel of Record
Rifkin Weiner Livingston LLC
4800 Hampden Lane
Suite 820
Bethesda, MD 20814

cfax@rwllaw.com
410-274-1453
Party name: Rosalie Simon, et al.