No. 23A603
Title:Angela Germaine Spencer, By and Through Next Friend and Mother of A.S., a Minor, Applicant
v.
The County of Harrison, Texas
Docketed:January 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-40548)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 28 2023Application (23A603) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2024 to February 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Application (23A603) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Application (23A603) to extend further the time from February 8, 2024 to March 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 01 2024Application (23A603) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Xiao Wang
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

x.wang@law.virginia.edu
434-924-8956
Party name: Angela Germaine Spencer, By and Through Next Friend and Mother of A.S., a minor