No. 23A602
Title:Jeanna Norris, et al., Applicants
v.
Samuel L. Stanley, Jr., in His Official Capacity as President of Michigan State University, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1200)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2023Application (23A602) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2024 to February 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherOther
Jan 03 2024Application (23A602) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.
Jan 25 2024Application (23A602) to extend further the time from February 8, 2024 to March 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Written RequestWritten RequestProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Application (23A602) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 9, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jenin Younes
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street, Suite 450 NW
Washington, DC 20036

jenin.younes@ncla.legal
6465925877
Party name: Jeanna Norris, et al.
John Julian VecchioneThe New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.legal
2029186902
Party name: Jeanna Norris, et al.