No. 23A600
Title:Ali Hamza Al Bahlul, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 2, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1097)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2023Application (23A600) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Application (23A600) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michel Paradis
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Department of Defense, MCDO
1620 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301

MICHEL.D.PARADIS.CIV@MAIL.MIL
9175202202
Party name: Ali Hamza Al Bahlul
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States