No. 23A597
Title:Ileen Cain, Applicant
v.
Mercy College, et al.
Docketed:December 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-432)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2023Application (23A597) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 25, 2024 to March 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jan 03 2024Application (23A597) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ileen Cain
    Counsel of Record
C/O Israel Engelman, Shippers Express
41 Schermerhorn St.
Brooklyn Heights, NY 11201

(347) 881-5922
Party name: Ileen Cain