No. 23A593
Title:Martin Akerman, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(24-0060/AF)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2023Application (23A593) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 17, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Application (23A593) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Akerman
    Counsel of Record
2001 North Adams Street
Unit 440
Arlington , VA 22201

202-656-5601
Party name: Martin Akerman
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States