No. 23A591
Title:Jeffri Dávila-Reyes, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2089)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2023Application (23A591) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2024 to February 5, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Application (23A591) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until February 5, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Application (23A591) to extend further the time from February 5, 2024 to March 3, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Written RequestProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Application (23A591) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raymond L. Sanchez-Maceira
    Counsel of Record
Sanchez-Maceira Law Firm
361 Calle Del Parque Cond.
Magdalena Tower Suite 203
Santurce, PR 00912

sanchezlaw@prtc.net
7877213370
Party name: Jeffri Davila-Reyes
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States