No. 23A589
Title:Rian Waters, Applicant
v.
Aidan Kearney
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-13373)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2023Application (23A589) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2024 to February 8, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Application (23A589) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rian G. Waters50 State Street
Springfield, MA 01103

Watersrian@gmail.com
(530) 739-8951
Party name: Rian Waters