No. 23A588
Title:Justin Willis, Applicant
v.
Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-11130)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2023Application (23A588) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2023 to January 18, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Dec 27 2023Application (23A588) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 17, 2024.
Jan 17 2024Application (23A588) to extend further the time from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written Request
Jan 17 2024Application of Justin Willis for a further extension of time submitted.
Written Request
Jan 23 2024Application (23A588) denied by Justice Thomas.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William R. Ponall
    Counsel of Record
Ponall Law
253 North Orlando Avenue
Suite 200
Maitland, FL 32751

bponall@ponalllaw.com
4076221144
Party name: Justin Willis