No. 23A584
Title:Tony Love, Applicant
v.
Ron Neal, Warden
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2406)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2023Application (23A584) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 02 2024Application (23A584) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until March 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Parker Andrew Rider-Longmaid
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

parker.rider-longmaid@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: Tony Love