No. 23A582
Title:Shalini Ahmed, Applicant
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:December 22, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1686)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2023Application (23A582) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2024 to March 10, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Application (23A582) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 11, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shalini Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
505 North Street
Greenwich, CT 06830

(646) 309-8110
Party name: Shalini Ahmed
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: SEC