No. 23A578
Title:NVIDIA Corporation, et al., Applicants
v.
E. Ohman J:or Fonder AB, et al.
Docketed:December 22, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-15604)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2023Application (23A578) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 13, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Application (23A578) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: NVIDIA Corp., et al.