No. 23A577
Title:Tyler Gonzales, fka Tyler A. Montour, Applicant
v.
Cheryl Eplett, Warden
Docketed:December 22, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2393)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2023Application (23A577) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 02 2024Application (23A577) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until March 4, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Arden Ettinger
    Counsel of Record
Federal Community Defender Office
601 Walnut Street
Suite 540 West
Philadelphia, PA 19106

JESSICA_ETTINGER@FD.ORG
215-928-1100
Party name: Tyler Gonzales