No. 23A574
Title:Wayne Resper, Applicant
v.
Yescare Corp., fka Corizon Health, Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 21, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-7021)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2023Application (23A574) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2023 to February 15, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 21 2023Application (23A574) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 15, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Wayne Resper
    Counsel of Record
#274319
W.C.I.
13800 McMullen Highway, S.W.
Cumberland, MD 21502

Party name: Wayne Resper