No. 23A572 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Darrell Wayne Frederick, Applicant
v.
Christe Quick, Warden
Docketed:December 21, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-6131)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2023Application (23A572) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2023 to February 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 26 2023Application (23A572) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Emma Victoria Rolls
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
215 Dean A. McGee
Suite 707 Old Post Office Building
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

emma_rolls@fd.org
4056095975
Party name: Darrell Frederick