No. 23A566 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Areli Escobar, Applicant
v.
Texas
Docketed:December 19, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(No. WR-81,574-02)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2023Application (23A566) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2023 to January 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Application (23A566) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 25, 2024.
Jan 15 2024Application (23A566) to extend further the time from January 25, 2024 to February 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Application (23A566) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein, Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

DW@GOLDSTEINRUSSELL.COM
202-240-8433
Party name: Areli Escobar