No. 23A564 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Donte Johnson, Applicant
v.
Nevada
Docketed:December 19, 2023
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nevada
   Case Numbers:(83796)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2023Application (23A564) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2023 to February 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Application (23A564) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Randolph Makoto Fiedler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Nevada
411 E. Bonneville Ave.
Suite 250
Las Vegas, NV 89101

Randolph_Fiedler@fd.org
702-388-6577
Party name: Donte Johnson