No. 23A563
Title:Stephen Aguiar, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-6443, 23-6446)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2023Application (23A563) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 13, 2023 to February 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Dec 20 2023Application (23A563) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 12, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen Aguiar
    Counsel of Record
#03722-082
FMC Devens
P.O. Box 879
Ayer, MA 01432

Party name: Stephen Aguiar
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States