No. 23A562
Title:Tarun Surti, Applicant
v.
Fleet Engineers, Inc.
Docketed:December 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2001, 22-2076)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2023Application (23A562) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 20, 2023 to February 18, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 18 2023Application (23A562) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 18, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tarun Surti
    Counsel of Record
5928 Westhemer Dr.
Brentwood, TN 37027

vflaps@gmail.com
(615) 812-6164
Party name: Tarun Surti