No. 23A561
Title:Anne Davis, on Behalf of Braeden Davis, Applicant
v.
District of Columbia
Docketed:December 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-7134)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2023Application (23A561) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2023 to February 23, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Application (23A561) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM
202-637-2200
Party name: Anne Davis