No. 23A559
Title:Colin Montague, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2975-cr)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2023Application (23A559) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2024 to March 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Application (23A559) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 1, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

MKIMBERLY@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Colin Montague
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America