No. 23A558
Title:Gerald D. Fields, Applicant
v.
Jay Forshey, Warden
Docketed:December 18, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3031)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2023Application (23A558) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 3, 2024 to March 3, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Application (23A558) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 3, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Stuart Pollis
    Counsel of Record
Milton A. Kramer Law Clinic Center
Case Western Reserve University School of Law
11075 East Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44106

andrew.pollis@case.edu
2163682766
Party name: Gerald Fields