No. 23A555 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Brandon Michael Council, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 15, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1, 21-8)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2023Application (23A555) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2023 to February 23, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Application (23A555) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

CATE.STETSON@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
2026375491
Party name: Brandon Council
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America