No. 23A554
Title:Joshua James Duggar, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 15, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-2178)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2023Application (23A554) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 27, 2023 to February 25, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Application (23A554) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 25, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Justin Keith Gelfand
    Counsel of Record
Marguils Gelfand LLC
7700 Bonhomme Avenue
Suite 750
St. Louis, MO 63105

JUSTIN@MARGULISGELFAND.COM
314-390-0230
Party name: Joshua Duggar
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States