No. 23A550
Title:Karyn D. Stanley, Applicant
v.
City of Sanford, Florida
Docketed:December 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-10002)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2023Application (23A550) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2024 to March 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Application (23A550) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 8, 2024.
Jan 23 2024Application (23A550) to extend further the time from February 8, 2024 to March 9, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written Request
Jan 30 2024Application (23A550) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler LLP
2001 K Street, NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

DEEPAK@GUPTAWESSLER.COM
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Karyn D. Stanley
Attorneys for Respondent
Jessica Christy Conner
    Counsel of Record
Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, P.A.
201 E. Pine Street, Suite 1200
Orlando, FL 32801

Jessica.Conner@DRML-Law.com
407-422-4310
Party name: City of Sanford, Florida
Jessica Christy Conner
    Counsel of Record
Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, P.A.
201 E. Pine Street, Suite 1200
Orlando, FL 32801

Jessica.Conner@DRML-Law.com
407-422-4310
Party name: City of Sanford, Florida