No. 23A546
Title:National Religious Broadcasters, Applicant
v.
Copyright Royalty Board, et al.
Docketed:December 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1243, 21-1244, 21-1245)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2023Application (23A546) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 26, 2023 to January 25, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 15 2023Application (23A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2024.
Jan 05 2024Application (23A546) to extend further the time from January 25, 2024 to February 23, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Jan 09 2024Application (23A546) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: National Religious Broadcasters Noncommercial Music License Committee