No. 23A545
Title:Michael Shane McCormick, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:December 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-5587)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2023Application (23A545) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2023 to February 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Lower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 14 2023Application (23A545) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 23, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

LDROSENBERG@JONESDAY.COM
202-879-7622
Party name: Michael Shane McCormick
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States