No. 23A539
Title:Martin Akerman, Applicant
v.
Merit Systems Protection Board
Docketed:December 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-2046)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2023Application (23A539) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 18, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 15 2023Application (23A539) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 29, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin Akerman
    Counsel of Record
2001 North Adams Street
Unit 440
Arlington , VA 22201

202-656-5601
Party name: Martin Akerman