No. 23A535
Title:Nicholas Harding, Applicant
v.
Google LLC
Docketed:December 12, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-11974)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2023Application (23A535) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2023 to February 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Dec 12 2023Application (23A535) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 17, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas Harding
    Counsel of Record
3859 English Colony Dr. N.
Jacksonville, FL 32257

3136703068
Party name: Nicholas Harding